SC H3363 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 23-31-210, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Issuance Of Concealed Weapon Permits, So As To Revise The Definition Of The Term "concealable Weapon" To Allow A Permit Holder To Carry A Concealable Weapon Openly On His Person.
Title
Concealed weapons permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis |
2019-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Pope, Elliott, B.Cox, Stringer, G.R.Smith, Loftis |
2019-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3363&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3363_20181218.htm |