SC H3357 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of South Carolina Highway 9 In Lancaster County From The Lancaster Bypass To South Carolina Highway 522 "sheriff Williford Lee Faile Memorial Highway" And Place Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of The Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Sheriff Williford Faile Memorial Intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-01-26 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2023-01-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |