SC H3355 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ridgeway
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ridgeway
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, So As To Enact The "driving Under The Influence Of An Electronic Device Or Dui-e Law", To Amend Section 56-5-3890, Relating To The Unlawful Use Of A Wireless Communications Device While Operating A Motor Vehicle, So As To Revise The Definition Of Certain Terms, Revise The Circumstances When It Is Unlawful To Use A Wireless Device, To Create The Offense Of Driving While Using An Electronic Device, To Make Technical Revisions, And To Provide That At Certain Points Along The State's Interstate Highways, The Department Of Transportation Shall Notify Motorists Of The Provisions Of This Act.
Title
Driving Under the Influence of an Electronic Device or DUI-E
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House: Table Motion To Reconsider (Y: 76 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit To Judiciary (Y: 23 N: 88 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit To Judiciary (Y: 23 N: 88 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ridgeway |
2020-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2020-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest, Oremus, Wooten |
2020-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt |
2019-03-20 | House | Committed to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lucas |
2019-03-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell |
2019-03-06 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-20-19 |
2019-02-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk |
2019-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2019-02-14 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-02-13 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-02-13 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2019-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Chellis |
2019-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2019-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardee, Govan |
2019-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2019-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stringer |
2019-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McGinnis |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |