SC H3352 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-30 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-30 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-1171, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Deduction Of Military Retirement Income, So As To Exempt All Military Retirement Income From South Carolina Income Taxes.
Title
Military retirement income, deductions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell, Oremus, Hixon |
2022-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2022-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter |
2022-01-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton, Bustos |
2021-12-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dabney |
2021-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2021-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bryant |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |