SC H3348 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Sections 12-6-3710 And 12-6-3720 So As To Allow A Tax Credit To Any Taxpayer That Employs A Formerly Incarcerated Individual In An Apprenticeship Program, Or A Veteran Of The Armed Forces In An Apprenticeship Program, To Specify The Taxes For Which The Credit May Be Applied, And Specify Eligibility Requirements.
Title
Tax credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-02-18 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-02-17 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2022-02-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-17 | House | Amended |
2022-02-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley, W.Newton, Kirby |
2022-02-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2022-02-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, Gilliard, Murray |
2022-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley |
2022-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill |
2021-04-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, M.M.Smith, Dillard |
2021-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3479 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson