SC H3332 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-6)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ott, S.Williams, Bales, Wooten, Huggins, Thayer
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ott, S.Williams, Bales, Wooten, Huggins, Thayer
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-37-250, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Homestead Property Tax Exemption Allowed For Persons Who Are Over The Age Of Sixty-five Years, Disabled, Or Legally Blind, So As To Increase The Exemption Amount From The First Fifty Thousand Dollars To The First Seventy-five Thousand Dollars Of The Fair Market Value Of The Homestead; And To Repeal Section 12-37-245 Relating To An Obsolete Reference To The Homestead Exemption.
Title
Homestead exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ott, S.Williams, Bales, Wooten, Huggins, Thayer |
2020-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby, Wheeler, Howard, Rutherford, McKnight, Atkinson, Funderburk, Ridgeway, Stavrinakis, Kimmons, Bernstein |
2020-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson, Simmons, Govan, Dillard, Hosey, Anderson, Hart, Garvin, Brown, Moore, Cobb-Hunter, Bamberg |
2020-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McDaniel, King |
2020-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose |
2020-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons, Weeks |
2019-02-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers |
2019-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams, Gilliard |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0910 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3332&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3332_20181218.htm |