SC H3325 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 44-63-74, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Mandatory Electronic Filing Of Death Certificates With The Bureau Of Vital Statistics Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, So As To Eliminate Exemptions For Physicians Who Certify Fewer Than Twelve Deaths Annually; And For Other Purposes. - Ratified Title
Title
Death certificates
Sponsors
Rep. John King [D] | Rep. Chardale Murray [D] | Rep. Michael Rivers [D] | Rep. Marvin Smith [R] |
Rep. Anne Parks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 157 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 07/01/22 | |
2022-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 200 | |
2022-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2022-05-12 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-116 Nays-1 |
2021-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-02 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Murray, Rivers, M.M.Smith, Parks |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |