SC H3309 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 15 To Chapter 3, Title 23 So As To Provide That The State Law Enforcement Division Shall Create And Operate A Statewide Sexual Assault Kit Tracking System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SLED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn
2019-05-09SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-05-09SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-08HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Bannister, Norrell, Gilliard
2019-05-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2019-05-01HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose
2019-04-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback