SC H3307 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That The State Law Enforcement Division Shall Establish And Maintain A Case Tracking System And Searchable Website That Includes Certain Information About Property Seized By Law Enforcement Agencies And Forfeited Under State Law Or Under Any Agreement With The Federal Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SLED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 86 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Table Motion To Reconsider (Y: 20 N: 80 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-07SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-09HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-05 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-04HouseRoll call Yeas-86 Nays-17
2019-04-04HouseRead second time
2019-04-04HouseAmended
2019-04-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
2019-04-03HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 4-4-19
2019-04-02HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19
2019-04-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan
2019-03-28HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 4-2-19
2019-03-28HouseReconsidered
2019-03-27HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-6
2019-03-27HouseRead second time
2019-03-27HouseAmended
2019-03-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore, Gilliard, Blackwell
2019-03-26HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-27-19
2019-03-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2019-03-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Hyde
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace
2019-02-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry, Crawford, Allison, Yow, Hyde, Daning, Elliott, Hewitt, B.Newton, G.R.Smith, Hixon, Taylor, Magnuson, Gagnon, Johnson, Clary, Pendarvis, McKnight, Rose, Cogswell, Cobb-Hunter
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3307&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3307_20181218.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3307_20190320.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3307_20190321.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3307_20190327.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3307_20190404.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3307_20190405.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3307_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3307_20190508.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16195
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16223
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16269

Bill Comments

feedback