SC H3284 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson, Ott
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "hearing Aid Coverage For Children Act", To Provide Definitions, To Require Group Health Insurance And Group Health Benefit Plans To Cover Hearing Aids And Replacement Hearing Aids For An Insured With Impaired Hearing Who Is Eighteen Years Of Age Or Younger, To Provide For The Scope Of Coverage, And For Other Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hearing Aides Coverage for Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson, Ott
2019-04-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
2019-02-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham
2019-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns, Long
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
387148(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback