SC H3261 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 7-11-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Methods Of Nominating Candidates, So As To Prohibit A Candidate From Filing More Than One Statement Of Intention Of Candidacy For A Single Election, And To Prohibit A Candidate From Being Nominated By More Than One Political Party For A Single Office In An Election; And To Amend Section 7-13-320, Relating To Ballots And Specifications, So As To Prohibit A Candidate's Name From Appearing On The Ballot More Than Once.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Candidate nominations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3206 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell
S0559 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
71110(n/a)See Bill Text
713320(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback