SC H3256 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Amendment To Article Xv Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, By Adding Section 4 So As To Provide Procedures For Recalling And Removing From Public Office Persons Holding Elected Public Offices Of The State Or Its Political Subdivisions In The Executive And Legislative Branches Of State Or Local Governments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recalling or removing from public office persons holding elected public offices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: May, Dabney
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback