SC H3253 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, So As To Enact The "veterans Nursing Degree Opportunity Act"; And By Adding Article 3 To Chapter 33, Title 40 So As To Authorize The Development And Implementation Of Veteran Associate Of Science In Nursing Degree Programs And Veteran Bachelor Of Science In Nursing Degree Programs To Enable Military Veterans With Relevant Military Training And Experience To Expedite The Transition From Military Life To A Professional Career In Nursing, To Provide Necessary Definitions, To Require A Collaborative Effort By The Commission On Higher Education, State Board Of Nursing, Board For Technical And Comprehensive Education, Department Of Veterans' Affairs, And The South Carolina Nurses Association To Identify Gaps Between Relevant Military Education And Training And Academic Requirements For Undergraduate Nursing Education Programs And Degrees Approved By The State Board Of Nursing And Licensure By The Board, And To Approve Curriculum To Enable Military Veterans To Apply Such Education And Training Toward Requirements For An Associate's Degree In Nursing Or A Bachelor's Degree In Nursing At Participating Institutions Of Higher Learning, And Licensure As A Licensed Practical Nurse Or Registered Nurse, Among Other Things.
Title
Veterans Nursing Degree Opportunity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Stringer [R] | Rep. John Mccravy [R] | Rep. Bobby Cox [R] | Rep. Thomas Pope [R] |
Rep. Linda Bennett [R] | Rep. James Burns [R] | Rep. Patrick Haddon [R] | Rep. Sandy McGarry [R] |
Rep. Sylleste Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis |
2021-02-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry |
2021-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns, Haddon |
2021-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3253&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3253_20201209.htm |