SC H3252 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 23-9-25, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The V-safe Program, So As To Simplify The Definition Of Fire Departments And The Projects On Which Grant Funds May Be Expended, To Increase Grant Amounts, And To Specify Projects For Which Grants May Be Awarded; To Amend Section 38-7-20, As Amended, Relating To Insurance Premium Taxes, So As To Direct Additional Funds To The V-safe Program; To Amend Section 12-37-935, Relating To The Additional Depreciation Reimbursement, So As To Direct A Percentage Of Such Funds To The V-safe Program; And To Amend Section 11-11-150, Relating To Deductions From The Estimate Of Revenues, So As To Make A Conforming Change.
Title
V-SAFE Program
Sponsors
Rep. Brian White [R] | Rep. Bart Blackwell [R] | Rep. William Whitmire [R] | Rep. West Cox [R] |
Rep. Sandy McGarry [R] | Rep. Brandon Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0 |
2022-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-06 | House | Amended |
2022-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry, B.Newton |
2022-04-06 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2022-04-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-05 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-03-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whitmire, W.Cox |
2022-03-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell |
2022-01-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 11 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 37 | 935 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 9 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 7 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |