SC H3244 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Conference committee appointed Shealy, Bennett, Sabb
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Conference committee appointed Shealy, Bennett, Sabb
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "employment First Initiative Act" By Adding Chapter 5 To Title 41 So As To Provide Necessary Definitions, To Establish Policies Supportive Of Competitive And Integrated Employment Of Individuals With Disabilities, To Create Related Responsibilities For State Agencies And Political Subdivisions Of The State, To Create The "south Carolina Employment First Oversight Commission", And To Provide For The Composition, Function, And Duties Of The Commission.
Title
Employment First Initiative Act
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Collins [R] | Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. Chip Huggins [R] | Rep. Anne Thayer [R] |
Rep. Carl Anderson [D] | Rep. Micajah Caskey [R] | Rep. Jerry Govan [D] | Rep. Shedron Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Shealy, Bennett, Sabb |
2021-05-13 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Cogswell, Collins, Jefferson |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2021-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-3 |
2021-05-12 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-05-12 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2021-05-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-9 |
2021-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-02 | House | Amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Govan, S.Williams |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-02-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson |
2021-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2021-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |