SC H3243 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 41-1-35 So As To Provide People Who Are Lawfully Present In This State And Are Not Precluded From Establishing Residency Under Federal Immigration Law May Establish Residency And Be Eligible For Occupational Or Professional Licensure Under The Provisions Of This Chapter, Provided Other Licensure Requirements Are Met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-16 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-03-15SenateAmended
2021-05-06SenateRecalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-04-07SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-04-07SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-07HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-04-06HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-5
2021-04-06HouseRead second time
2021-04-06HouseAmended
2021-04-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Matthews, S.Williams, Anderson
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41135(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback