SC H3234 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 38-43-106, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Insurance Producer Continuing Education Requirements, So As To Provide That A Producer With A Minimum Of Thirty Years Of Experience Is Not Subject To The Continuing Education Requirement.
Title
Insurance producer, continuing education requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Brown [D] | Rep. Chip Huggins [R] | Rep. Richard Martin [R] | Rep. Nathan Ballentine [R] |
Rep. Jason Elliott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott |
2019-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3234&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3234_20181218.htm |