SC H3233 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Trantham, West, Vaughan
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Sections 44-48-115 And 44-48-180 So As To Provide For The Right To Challenge Commitment To The Sexually Violent Predator Treatment Program Based On Ineffective Assistance Of Counsel And To Give Priority Status To Sexually Violent Predator Cases For Purposes Of Scheduling Court Proceedings Respectively; By Amending Sections 44-48-30, 44-48-40, 44-48-50, 44-48-80, 44-48-90, 44-48-100, 44-48-110, 44-48-120, 44-48-130, 44-48-150, And 44-48-160, All Relating To The Sexually Violent Predator Act, So As To Add Definitions For "qualified Evaluator" And "resident" And Change The Definition Of "likely To Engage In Acts Of Sexual Violence", To Establish Effective Dates For The Granting Of Supervised Reentry, To Require Multidisciplinary Teams To Determine Whether There Is Probable Cause To Believe A Person Is A Sexually Violent Predator, To Provide For The Use Of Court-appointed Qualified Evaluators And To Establish Certain Timelines For Evaluations, To Allow For The Use Of Independent, Qualified Evaluators In Certain Circumstances, To Require Courts To Conduct A Nonjury Hearing Before Release Of A Person Found Incompetent To Stand Trial, To Establish Certain Benchmarks For Additional Reviews Of Mental Conditions, To Establish Certain Requirements Regarding Evaluators In Proceedings On Petitions For Release, To Allow Access To Sealed Court Records By The Attorney General And Other Counsel Of Record, To Make Conforming Changes, And For Other Purposes; And By Amending Section 24-21-32, Relating To Reentry Supervision, So As To Make Inmates Determined To Be Sexually Violent Predators Ineligible For Reentry Supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexually Violent Predator Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Trantham, West, Vaughan
2023-03-01HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott, B.J.Cox, Hewitt, Anderson, Mitchell, Yow, Hyde, Moss, Lawson, McCabe, Gagnon, Taylor, Hixon, Oremus, Ligon, Felder, M.M.Smith, Davis, B.L.Cox, O'Neal, Guffey, McGinnis, Thayer, Guest, Brittain, Erickson, Herbkersman, Bradley, Hager, Connell, Pope, Forrest
2023-01-31 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2022-12-08HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-12-08HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0146 (Similar To) 2023-05-25 - Act No. 19

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242132(n/a)See Bill Text
4448100(n/a)See Bill Text
4448110(n/a)See Bill Text
4448115(n/a)See Bill Text
4448120(n/a)See Bill Text
4448130(n/a)See Bill Text
4448150(n/a)See Bill Text
4448160(n/a)See Bill Text
4448180(n/a)See Bill Text
444830(n/a)See Bill Text
444840(n/a)See Bill Text
444850(n/a)See Bill Text
444880(n/a)See Bill Text
444890(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback