SC H3226 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers, S.Williams
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 44-6-120 So As To Provide That Beginning January 1, 2022, An Adult Sixty-five Years Of Age Or Younger Whose Income Is At Or Below One Hundred Thirty-three Percent Of The Federal Poverty Level, With A Five Percent Income Disregard, Is Eligible For Medicaid As Provided For In The Patient Protection And Affordable Care Act, And Amendments To That Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers, S.Williams
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
446120(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback