SC H3219 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
Pending: Senate Family and Veterans Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
Pending: Senate Family and Veterans Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 63-7-35 So As To Require The Department Of Social Services To Establish A Program To Pay For Certain Expenses Incidental To Becoming Legally Authorized To Drive For Children Fifteen Years Of Age Or Older Who Reside In Out-of-home Care, With Exceptions; To Amend Section 56-1-110, Relating To Imputed Liability Of A Person Signing A Driver's License Application For An Unemancipated Minor, So As To Provide An Exception To Liability For, Among Others, Foster Parents; And To Amend Section 63-7-2310, Relating To Foster Care, So As To Provide Immunity From Liability For Foster Parents With Exceptions.
Title
DSS
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Collins [R] | Rep. Merita Allison [R] | Rep. Rosalyn Henderson-Myers [D] | Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R] | Rep. Jerry Govan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0 |
2021-04-28 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-28 | House | Amended |
2021-04-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan |
2021-04-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2021-04-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 2310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |