SC H3208 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-67-210, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Unlawful Passing Of A School Bus By Another School Bus, So As To Provide That A School Bus May Lawfully Pass Another School Bus On A Multilane Highway; And To Repeal Section 59-67-515 Relating To Speed Limits For Public School Buses.
Title
School bus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-116 Nays-0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2021-02-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |