SC H3202 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allow An Income Tax Credit For Contributions To A Scholarship Funding Organization That Provides Grants For Students To Attend Certain Independent And Home Schools, To Specify The Manner In Which The Credit Is Claimed, To Specify The Process By Which Certain Organizations And Schools Become Eligible, To Specify Certain Information Which Must Be Made Public, And To Allow The Department Of Revenue To Enforce The Provisions Of The Credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2019-03-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2019-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton, Hewitt
2019-02-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole
2019-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham, Morgan
2019-02-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry
2019-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile
2019-02-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis, B.Cox, Herbkersman, W.Newton, Pope, Simrill, Forrest
2019-02-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns, Chumley, Long, Loftis
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Stringer, G.R.Smith, Hixon
2019-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Murphy
2019-01-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten, Taylor
2019-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace
2019-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary, Willis
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0131 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Finance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1263685(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback