SC H3194 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Campsen, Matthews, Talley, Harpootlian, Adams
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Mar 10 @ 2:00 am in Gressette Room 207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorize The Sale Of The Assets Of The South Carolina Public Service Authority And The Assumption Or Defeasment Of Its Liabilities Or The Management Of The Operations Of The Public Service Authority By A Third Party Or Entity; To Create A Special Committee Of The General Assembly To Further Negotiate The Terms And Conditions Of The Preferred Sale Recommendation Of The Department Of Administration Regarding The Public Service Authority And The Preferred Management Recommendation Of The Department Of Administration Regarding The Public Service Authority, To Provide That The Special Committee Shall Report One Recommendation To Each House Of The General Assembly For Its Approval, And To Provide For The Manner In Which The Selected Proposal Shall Take Effect; And To Amend Chapter 31, Title 58, Code Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Public Service Authority, So As To Further Provide For The Governance And Operations Of The Authority In Certain Particulars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assets

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Table Amendment 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 76 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Campsen, Matthews, Talley, Harpootlian, Adams
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-01-27HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-01-27 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-01-26HouseRoll call Yeas-89 Nays-26
2021-01-26HouseRead second time
2021-01-26HouseAmended
2021-01-26HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Carter
2021-01-13HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0444 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback