SC H3194 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 48-43-397 SO AS TO DEFINE THE TERM OFFSHORE DRILLING, TO PROVIDE PORTIONS OF LEASE OR ROYALTY PAYMENTS PAID BY PERSONS PERMITTED TO ENGAGE IN OFFSHORE DRILLING IN THE ATLANTIC OCEAN WITHIN THE TERRITORIAL WATERS OF SOUTH CAROLINA AND THAT ACCRUE TO THE BENEFIT OF THIS STATE MUST BE ALLOCATED AND EXPENDED IN A CERTAIN MANNER.
Title
Define The Term Offshore Drilling, To Provide Portions Of Lease Or Royalty Payments Paid By Persons Permitted To Engage In Offshore Drilling In The Atlantic Ocean Within The Territorial Waters Of South Carolina And That Accrue To The Benefit Of This State Must Be Allocated And Expended In A Certain Manner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis | |
2010-02-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bedingfield | |
2009-01-28 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: E.H.Pitts, Owens | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-85 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-85 | |
2008-12-16 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2008-12-16 | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3194&session=118 |