SC H3164 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-63-105 So As To Provide That Beginning With The 2022-2023 School Year, Public School Districts Shall Make Advanced Placement Testing And Certain Other Testing Available To Home School Students Residing In The District If The Tests Are Made Available To Students Attending Public Schools In The Districts, And To Provide Related Duties Of School Boards And The State Department Of Education.
Title
AP testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-08 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-1 |
2021-04-07 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-07 | House | Amended |
2021-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones |
2021-04-06 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2021-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns |
2021-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry |
2021-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham, Oremus |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |