SC H3163 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 67-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sandifer
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "south Carolina Stands For Life Act" By Adding Article 6 To Chapter 41, Title 44 So As To Require Testing For A Detectable Fetal Heartbeat Before An Abortion Is Performed On A Pregnant Women And To Prohibit The Performance Of An Abortion When A Fetal Heartbeat Is Detected, Both With Medical Emergency Exceptions, To Define Certain Terms, To Require Certain Documentation And Recordkeeping By Physicians Performing Abortions, To Create A Civil Action For A Pregnant Woman Upon Whom An Abortion Is Performed, To Create Criminal Penalties, And For Other Purposes; To Amend Section 44-41-460, Relating To Required Reporting Of Abortion Data To The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, So As To Add Reporting Of Fetal Heartbeat Testing And Patient Medical Condition Data; To Amend Section 44-41-330, Relating To A Pregnant Woman's Right To Know Certain Pregnancy Information, So As To Require Notification Of The Detection Of A Fetal Heartbeat; By Adding Article 8 To Chapter 41, Title 44 So As To Prohibit Dismemberment Abortions, With Exceptions, To Define Certain Terms, To Provide For Injunctive Relief And Civil And Criminal Penalties, And For Other Purposes; By Adding Article 10 To Chapter 41, Title 44 So As To Establish Certain Notice Requirements Addressing The Possibility Of Reversing The Effects Of Certain Chemical Abortions Applicable To Private Offices And Facilities In Which Abortions Are Performed And To Physicians Of Patients Considering A Chemical Abortion, To Define Certain Terms, To Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Publish Printed Materials About The Possibility Of Reversing Certain Chemical Abortions And To Make The Information Available On The Department's Website, To Establish Certain Requirements Applicable To Physicians Who Prescribe A Chemical Abortion Pill; To Create Civil And Criminal Penalties For Violation Of The Provisions Of The Article, To Create A Private Right Of Action For A Woman Upon Whom A Chemical Abortion Is Performed In Violation Of The Provisions Of The Article, With Exceptions, And For Other Purposes; And By Adding Section 44-41-95 So As To Provide That If Roe V. Wade Is Overturned, Abortion Shall Become Illegal In South Carolina, And For Other Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Stands for Life Act

Sponsors

Rep. John Mccravy [R]Rep. Melissa Oremus [R]Rep. John West [R]Rep. Patrick Haddon [R]
Rep. Wallace Jordan [R]Rep. Linda Bennett [R]Rep. Garry Smith [R]Rep. Ashley Trantham [R]
Rep. Roy Magnuson [R]Rep. Adam Morgan [R]Rep. Stewart Jones [R]Rep. William Bailey [R]
Rep. Bruce Bryant [R]Rep. James Burns [R]Rep. William Chumley [R]Rep. Bobby Cox [R]
Rep. Victor Dabney [R]Rep. Shannon Erickson [R]Rep. Doug Gilliam [R]Rep. Davey Hiott [R]
Rep. Max Hyde [R]Rep. Chip Huggins [R]Rep. Jeffrey Johnson [R]Rep. Steven Long [R]
Rep. Robert May [R]Rep. Richard Martin [R]Rep. Donald McCabe [R]Rep. Sandy McGarry [R]
Rep. Dennis Moss [R]Rep. Steve Moss [R]Rep. Roger Nutt [R]Rep. Tommy Stringer [R]
Rep. Anne Thayer [R]Rep. Mark Willis [R]Rep. Christopher Wooten [R]Rep. Merita Allison [R]
Rep. Nathan Ballentine [R]Rep. Bruce Bannister [R]Rep. Thomas Brittain [R]Rep. Joseph Bustos [R]
Rep. Neal Collins [R]Rep. Heather Crawford [R]Rep. Joseph Daning [R]Rep. Sylleste Davis [R]
Rep. Jason Elliott [R]Rep. Raye Felder [R]Rep. Cally Forrest [R]Rep. Russell Fry [R]
Rep. Craig Gagnon [R]Rep. Kevin Hardee [R]Rep. William Hixon [R]Rep. Mandy Kimmons [R]
Rep. Randy Ligon [R]Rep. Phillip Lowe [R]Rep. James Lucas [R]Rep. Brandon Newton [R]
Rep. Weston Newton [R]Rep. Thomas Pope [R]Rep. Marvin Smith [R]Rep. Murrell Smith [R]
Rep. Gary Simrill [R]Rep. Bill Taylor [R]Rep. William Whitmire [R]Rep. Christopher Murphy [R]
Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D]Rep. Richard Yow [R]Rep. Travis Moore [R]Rep. William Sandifer [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Sandifer
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, T.Moore
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0399 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4441330(n/a)See Bill Text
4441460(n/a)See Bill Text
444195(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback