SC H3134 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Sections 9-1-1220 And 9-11-240 So As To Provide That If A Participating Employer In The South Carolina Retirement System Or The Police Officers Retirement System, Respectively, Engages A Certain Member Of The System To Perform Services, Then The Participant Employer Shall Pay To The System The Employer Contribution That Would Be Required If The Member Received The Compensation As An Active Contributing Member Of The System; And To Amend Sections 9-1-1790 And 9-11-90, Relating To Retirement Benefits After Returning To Covered Employment Under The South Carolina Retirement System And The Police Officers Retirement System, Respectively, So As To Remove The Ten Thousand Dollar Earnings Limitation On An Employee Returning To Employment Who Has Not Been Engaged To Perform Services For A Participating Employer In The System Or Any Other System For At Least Twelve Consecutive Months Subsequent To Retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCRS and PORS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith
2021-02-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry
2021-01-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
911220(n/a)See Bill Text
911790(n/a)See Bill Text
911240(n/a)See Bill Text
91190(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback