SC H3130 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increase The Amount Of The Pension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voter registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
2019-03-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91030(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback