SC H3127 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establish The Mold Abatement And Remediation Study Committee To Study The Impact Of Mold In Public Areas And To Ascertain The Best Method Of Abatement For Mold In Public Areas; To Provide For The Membership Of The Study Committee, To Establish Certain Goals For The Study Committee, To Require The Study Committee To Prepare A Report For The General Assembly, And To Dissolve The Study Committee. - Ratified Title
Title
Mold Abatement and Remediation Study Committee
Sponsors
Rep. Chandra Dillard [D] | Rep. Rosalyn Henderson-Myers [D] | Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. David Weeks [D] |
Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D] | Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Act No. 112 | |
2019-03-27 | Effective date 03/20/19 | |
2019-03-20 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-03-19 | Ratified R 16 | |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-4 |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2019-02-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks |
2019-01-16 | House | Committed to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-16 | House | Recalled from Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |