SC H3079 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allow For A Different Method Of The Posting Of Notice Of Trespassing Involving Clearly Visible Purple-painted Boundaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trespassing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateRead second time
2019-05-08SenateAmended
2019-05-07SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-30SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Young (ch), Sabb, M.B.Matthews, Goldfinch, Talley
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-09SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-05HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-04HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-04-04HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-3
2019-04-04HouseRead second time
2019-04-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest
2019-04-02HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19
2019-04-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Brown
2019-03-06HouseCommitted to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-06HouseRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1611600(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback