SC H3078 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Include Nurse Practitioners, Certified Nurse Midwives, And Clinical Nurse Specialists Among Those Who May Certify People As Required To Obtain A Placard.
Title
Nursing professionals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill |
2016-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brannon |
2015-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Hicks |
2015-02-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: George |
2015-02-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith |
2015-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Williams, Wells, Corley, Herbkersman, Daning, Hicks, Long, Southard |
2015-01-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson |
2015-01-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2015-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson-Simpson, R.L.Brown, Sottile |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 33 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 33 | 34 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 33 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 33 | 46 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 33 | 47 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 33 | 48 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 195 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 71 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 1960 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3078&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/3078_20141211.htm |