SC H3046 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

By Adding Article 5 To Chapter 8, Title 16 Entitled "terrorism", To Provide For The Offense Of Furthering Terrorism, Define The Elements Of The Offense, And To Provide A Penalty; To Create The Offense Of Material Or Financial Support Of An Act Of Terrorism Or Concealment Of The Actions Or Plans Of Another To Carry Out An Act Of Terrorism, Define The Elements Of The Offense, And To Provide A Penalty; And To Provide For The Seizure And Forfeiture Of Real And Personal Property Used In Connection With An Offense Contained In The Article.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Terrorism

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-26SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-26HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-20HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
2019-03-20HouseRead second time
2019-03-20HouseAmended
2019-03-07HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-19-19
2019-03-06HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 3-7-19
2019-02-13HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 2-20-19
2019-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry
2019-02-05HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-02-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, West, Forrest, Bannister, Yow, Bales
2019-01-31 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Murphy, Clemmons
2019-01-30HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2019-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback