SC H3038 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For The Licensure Of Locksmiths; To Define Necessary Terminology; To Create The Board Of Locksmiths And To Provide For The Composition, Function, And Duties Of The Board; To Require Applicants For Licensure To Satisfy Certain Criteria, Complete Written Testing Requirements, And Submit To Fingerprint-based National Criminal Background Records Checks; And To Require Locksmiths To Complete Certain Continuing Education Requirements To Maintain Licensure.
Title
Licensing of locksmiths
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Duckworth [R] | Rep. Alan Clemmons [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Johnson [R] | Rep. Frank Atkinson [D] |
Rep. Joseph Daning [R] | Rep. Jackson Whipper [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Withdrawn |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-31 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-03-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-30 | House | Amended |
2017-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-01-11 | House | Member |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |