SC H3037 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 56-1-80, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Applications For Drivers' Licenses And Permits, So As To Provide The Department Of Motor Vehicles Must Provide A Form That Allows Applicants To Voluntarily Disclose Permanent Medical Conditions, To Provide For A Limited Number Of Permanent Medical Conditions That May Be Contained In Motor Vehicle Drivers' Records, And To Revise The List Of Persons Who May Access Medical Information Contained In Drivers' Records, To Amend Section 56-1-3350, As Amended, Relating To Applications For Special Identification Cards, So As To Make Technical Changes, To Provide Applicants May Obtain Special Identification Cards That Indicate They Have Voluntarily Disclosed Permanent Medical Conditions, And Provide For Limited Disclosure Of This Information. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle registration, private passenger-carrying vehicle

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-23 Signed By Governor
2022-05-18 Ratified R 245
2022-05-12HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
2022-05-12HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2022-05-11SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2022-05-10SenateAmended
2022-04-20SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2022-04-20SenateRead second time
2022-03-24SenateAmended
2022-03-23SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2022-03-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-03-17SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation
2021-04-07SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-04-07SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-07HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-04-06HouseRoll call Yeas-115 Nays-0
2021-04-06HouseRead second time
2021-04-06HouseAmended
2021-04-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, King
2021-03-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers, Jefferson, R.Williams
2021-03-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: S.Williams
2021-03-17HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2021-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Matthews
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0575 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Referred to Committee on Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5613350(n/a)See Bill Text
56180(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3037&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3037_20201209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3037_20210317.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3037_20210406.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3037_20220317.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3037_20220321.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3037_20220323.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3037_20220324.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3037_20220420.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3037_20220510.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/H3037%202021-03-09%20amended.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19056
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=20898
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=21481

Bill Comments

feedback