SC H3037 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Statewide Advisory Referendum Must Be Conducted By The State Election Commission At The Same Time As The 2020 General Election On The Question Of Whether South Carolina Should Participate In Medicaid Expansion.
Title
Medicaid expansion
Sponsors
Rep. Kambrell Garvin [D] | Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D] | Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] |
Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] | Rep. Wendy Brawley [D] | Rep. Patricia Henegan [D] | Rep. Rosalyn Henderson-Myers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2019-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3037&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3037_20181218.htm |