SC H3010 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorialize The United States Congress To Enact Legislation And Take Certain Measures To Ensure That Students From South Carolina And Throughout The United States Have Access To Debt-free Higher Education At Public Colleges And Universities In Order To Reduce The Growing Crisis Of Student Loan Debt And Default, Particularly Among Low-income Students And African-american Students Disproportionately Burdened By The Crisis.
Title
Congress; enact legislation and take measures to ensure students have access to debt free higher education to reduce student debt
Sponsors
Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D] | Rep. Shedron Williams [D] |
Rep. Wendy Brawley [D] | Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson |
2019-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3010&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3010_20181218.htm |