SC H3006 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Malloy, Gregory, Hembree, Johnson
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Malloy, Gregory, Hembree, Johnson
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delete Language Requiring A State Agency To Periodically Review Regulations It Promulgates.
Title
Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 80 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Malloy, Gregory, Hembree, Johnson |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-02-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-80 Nays-26 |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Amended |
2015-02-10 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-02-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope |
2015-01-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kennedy, Rivers |
2015-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine, Toole, Simrill, Lucas |
2015-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder, Pitts |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |