SC H3001 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Amended on floor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Amended on floor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopt The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The 2021 And 2022 Sessions Of The General Assembly.
Title
House Rules
Sponsors
Rep. James Lucas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Amended on floor |
2021-03-10 | House | Amended on floor |
2021-01-13 | House | Amended on floor |
2020-12-01 | House | Introduced and adopted |