RI S0099 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Wholesale Prescription Drug Importation Program for the importation of wholesale prescription drugs from Canada to provide savings to Rhode Island consumers.
Title
Wholesale Prescription Drug Importation Program
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2023) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0099.pdf |