RI S3118 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
THE TOWN OF JOHNSTON MUNICIPAL COURT - Totally repeals the 1964 public law, which established the Johnston Municipal Court and which has never been amended and would enable the town of Johnston to establish a municipal court and housing court with expanded legal and equitable powers.
Title
Totally repeals the 1964 public law, which established the Johnston Municipal Court and which has never been amended and would enable the town of Johnston to establish a municipal court and housing court with expanded legal and equitable powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-29 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2024-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |