RI S3096 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school districts to maintain an annual registry for students requiring bus transportation to school. The purpose of this registration would be to assist each district's bus transportation plan to be more cost-efficient.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016) |