RI S3095 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the sale of electronic nicotine delivery systems to persons under eighteen (18) and would require a business selling, dealing or distributing an electronic nicotine delivery system to obtain a license from the department of health.
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Nicotine delivery system approval of amendment lc 005910/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |