RI S3092 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher learning to adopt a policy which grants amnesty for violations of drug/alcohol policies for those who report incidents of violence, including domestic violence, dating violence, stalking and sexual assault.
Title
Alcohol And/or Drug Use Amnesty For Reporters Of Violence At Institutions Of Higher Education
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |