RI S3092 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Virginia A. DePasquale to join Meagan Leinhauser and Timothy Raymond O’Brien, Jr., in marriage on or about September 26, 2014, within the City of Warwick, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |