RI S3080 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends by one year the time a person's name may remain on a list for judicial candidates.
Title
Courts - Judicial Selection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |