RI S3079 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Remove any financial limits on the value of property, both real and personal, tangible and intangible, that could be owned by the Episcopal Diocese of Rhode Island.
Title
In Amendment Of Of The Public Laws Of 1959 Entitled "in Amendment Of An Act, Entitled 'to Incorporate Certain Persons By The Name Of The Rhode Island Episcopal Convention,' Passed At The January Session 1844, And Of Several Acts In Amendment Thereof And In Addition Thereto"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |