RI S3073 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Ratifying An Amendment To The Constitution Of The United States Concerning The Elections Of Senators
Title
Joint Resolution Ratifying An Amendment To The Constitution Of The United States Concerning The Elections Of Senators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |