RI S3038 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-21 - House passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-21 - House passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And To Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Restriction On Gambling (amends The State Constitution To Provide That No Change In The Location Of Gambling Permitted In A Municipality Would Occur Without Further Approval Of The Voters In The Municipality.)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And To Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Restriction On Gambling (amends The State Constitution To Provide That No Change In The Location Of Gambling Permitted In A Municipality Would Occur Without Further Approval Of The Voters In The Municipality.)
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-21 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |