RI S3033 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows electors in the town of New Shoreham to authorize the creation of a new utility district or cooperative.
Title
Relating To The Town Of New Shoreham
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |