RI S2988 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the city council of the city of Providence to extend the period for tax exemption from a maximum of 20 years for an additional 10 years pertaining to the real property located 111 Westminster Street, also identified as 55 Kennedy Plaza.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-21 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2022) |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |